U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Razak
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • March 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 04, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 26, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • December 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • December 02, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • December 02, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Exclude]
  • August 28, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 23, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.