U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Figueroa-Serrano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 28, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • October 25, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 25, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • October 25, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 20, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.