U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Andres-Juan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • November 19, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • October 16, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 15, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.