U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • November 22, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 22, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • November 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 22, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 15, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.