U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:99-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jinadu
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Remark]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order of Garnishment]
  • January 15, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order of Garnishment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Service]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order of Garnishment]
  • December 04, 2019: [Writ]
  • December 02, 2019: [Oral Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 25, 2019: [Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.