U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • August 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 10, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • April 17, 2020: [Oral Order]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2020: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • January 24, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2020: [Certificate of Good Standing]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 20, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.