U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campusano Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 21, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • February 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 21, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 21, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • February 21, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 13, 2020: [Interpreter Requested]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 08, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 07, 2020: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • January 07, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.