U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:03-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blevins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Remark]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order of Garnishment]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Service]
  • February 14, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Service]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order of Garnishment]
  • January 23, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 22, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 15, 2020: [Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.