U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Rosario
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Remark]
  • September 15, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • August 17, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 29, 2021: [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • January 06, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Interpreter Requested]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 21, 2020: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • February 21, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • January 22, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 21, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.