U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:03-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reuter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 08, 2020: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL - Other]
  • June 08, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order of Garnishment]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2020: [Quash]
  • March 16, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 12, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Service]
  • February 27, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 24, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • February 24, 2020: [Stay]
  • February 24, 2020: [Change Venue]
  • February 05, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order of Garnishment]
  • January 24, 2020: [Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.