U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mejia-Domingo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 08, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 08, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order]
  • April 17, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 15, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 06, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 24, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • March 19, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 20, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 07, 2020: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • February 05, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.