U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Livingston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 28, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 25, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 07, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 07, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 07, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 06, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Exclude]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 19, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 14, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.