U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LV
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • July 06, 2021: [Travel]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 02, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • November 02, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Certificate of Good Standing]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 28, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • July 28, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • July 28, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 28, 2020: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 19, 2020: [Remark]
  • May 02, 2020: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • May 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 26, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 20, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.