U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez-Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 23, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 23, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 09, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 02, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.