U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00486
  • Case Name: Astellas Pharma Inc. et al v. Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • May 07, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 02, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 02, 2025: [Appendix]
  • May 02, 2025: [Joint Claim Construction Brief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Redacted Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 04 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 17, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 17, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 17, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 14, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Redact Transcript]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Request Transcript Redaction]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Oral Argument]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.