U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00880
  • Case Name: Gardner v. University of Delaware
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 24, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 08, 2024: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.