U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Slayback Pharma LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 14, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 09, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 07, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 07, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 05, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 05, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • March 14, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.