U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00162
  • Case Name: Pelham v. VBIT Technologies Corp. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set Aside Default]
  • May 05, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss - Person Juris.]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order - General]
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to Objections]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 28, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice - Other]
December, 2024
  • December 17, 2024: [Brief - Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • October 08, 2024: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • October 07, 2024: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • October 07, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 07, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.