U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00552
  • Case Name: Applied Ballistics Inc. v. Sheltered Wings, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • March 21, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Redacted Document]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.