U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00139
  • Case Name: CUMIS Insurance Society, Inc. v. Fitch et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 07, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Judgment - Default]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 02, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 01, 2025: [Default Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Scheduling Order - General]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.