U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00188
  • Case Name: Costa et al v. Whirlpool Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition (Reargument Only)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reargument]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • March 28, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Request for Oral Argument]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.