U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00266
  • Case Name: Shoulder Innovations, Inc. v. Catalyst Orthoscience Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice - Other]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Request for Oral Argument]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.