U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00358
  • Case Name: Camshaft Capital Fund, LP. et al v. BYJUs Alpha, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2025: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL - Third Circuit]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Terminate Case - Civil]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
  • October 10, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 10, 2024: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.