U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00980
  • Case Name: Louis Allis, LLC v. Ideal Electric Power Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 13, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.