U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00200
  • Case Name: Wright v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [USCA Order Terminating Appeal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Joinder]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 18, 2025: [Dismiss/Other]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Joinder]
  • March 27, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice - Other]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 11, 2024: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.