U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00519
  • Case Name: Ecolab Inc. et al v. Reckitt Benckiser LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
  • April 29, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • March 14, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 13, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Status Report]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.