U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00999
  • Case Name: North Atlantic Imports, LLC v. LoCo Crazy Good Cookers, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Remark]
  • May 05, 2025: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • May 01, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Deficiency re Courtesy Copies (SRF cases)]
  • April 04, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [- Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.