U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00780
  • Case Name: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al v. Synthon BV
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Service]
November, 2024
  • November 08, 2024: [Proposed Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.