U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00374
  • Case Name: Essity Hygiene and Health AB et al v. First Quality Products, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
November, 2024
  • November 13, 2024: [Proposed Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.