U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00790
  • Case Name: Amcor Rigid Packaging USA, LLC v. Graham Packaging Company Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • March 25, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 25, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service]
November, 2024
  • November 14, 2024: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.