U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00989
  • Case Name: Freites C., et al. v. Petroleos De Venezuela, S.A., et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • May 01, 2025: [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 01, 2025: [Seal Document]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 20, 2025: [Writ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Issued]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [Brief - Sur-Reply]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.