U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01308
  • Case Name: Bioverse, Inc. v. Bioverse Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • April 10, 2025: [Proposed Order]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • March 25, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 25, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Letter]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.