U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00621
  • Case Name: Pfizer Inc. et al v. Apotex, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 08, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 06, 2025: [Set/Reset Claim Construction Briefing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • March 26, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 26, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 18, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice - Other]
December, 2024
  • December 30, 2024: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.