U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00528
  • Case Name: Arnold et al v. X Corp. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting Briefing Schedule - open, ans, reply, surreply]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 16, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Oral Argument]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 25, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 24, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 19, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 19, 2025: [Seal Document]
February, 2025
  • February 06, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: [Redacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.