U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00888
  • Case Name: Warren v. Results Customer Solutions, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • May 13, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to -]
  • May 12, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • May 01, 2025: [Declaration]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 30, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 30, 2025: [Certify Class]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 26, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service]
January, 2025
  • January 14, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.