U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00224
  • Case Name: Welch Allyn, Inc. v. iRhythm Technologies, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 01, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.