U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Jordan v. Beskrone et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Case Stayed]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Brief - Sur-Reply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 23, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 15, 2025: [Dismiss/Other]
  • April 07, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint - Amended]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 26, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Complaint - Amended]
January, 2025
  • January 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.