U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01337
  • Case Name: MyPort Technologies, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • April 25, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 11, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • March 21, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
  • March 21, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • March 21, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 05 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.