U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01401
  • Case Name: Vestolit GmbH et al. v. Shell Chemical LP et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 25, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 24, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 24, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 23, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 23, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 23, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 23, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: [Declaration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.