U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01225
  • Case Name: Empower Brands LLC v. Tristar Products, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • May 01, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss/Other]
  • April 24, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 10, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 10, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 01, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • April 01, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • March 31, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • March 28, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • March 18, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
February, 2025
  • February 03, 2025: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.