U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Astellas Pharma Inc. et al v. Creekwood Pharmaceuticals LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Proposed Order]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 22, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 04 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 21, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 05 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Oral Order]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.