U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00715
  • Case Name: Washington v. Air Water Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Initial Disclosures]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Discovery Request]
  • April 25, 2025: [Deficiency Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: [Return of Service Executed]
February, 2025
  • February 10, 2025: [Answer to Interrogatories]
  • February 05, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.