U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00168
  • Case Name: Spire Global, Inc. v. Kpler Holding SA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • March 20, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 18, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Service]
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: [Seal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.