U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00206
  • Case Name: ESHA Research, LLC v. RLH Assets, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice - Other]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 24, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 24, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 22, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 22, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss/Improper Venue]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transfer Case]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed - 60 day ddl]
February, 2025
  • February 20, 2025: [No Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.