U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01175
  • Case Name: In Re: FTX Trading Ltd., et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 15, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 24, 2025: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Appellants Reply Brief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to -]
  • March 21, 2025: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Appellants Reply Brief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 12, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Substitute Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.