U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01161
  • Case Name: Advanced Accelerator Applications USA, Inc. et al v. Curium US LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • May 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 07, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 30, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Claim Construction Chart]
  • April 16, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 09, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Personal Jurisdiction]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.