U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01317
  • Case Name: Project for Privacy and Surveillance Accountability, Inc. v. Department of Defense et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Report]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.