U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00247
  • Case Name: Higgins et al v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • April 23, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 16, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 04, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • April 04, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 24, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 05, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.