U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00047
  • Case Name: K.Mizra LLC v. SonicWall Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
  • May 01, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • March 27, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.