U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01135
  • Case Name: GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA et al v. Moderna, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 14, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 09, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 09, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • April 02, 2025: [Proposed Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.